MS HB1266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 29-5-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Authority Of The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce To Provide Security Personnel In State Building Under Contracts Entered Into With The Department Of Finance And Administration For Such Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dept. of Agriculture; clarify use of security personnel to provide security services in state buildings under contract with DFA.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Bill Pigott [R] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Public Property |