MS HB1263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-17-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Crime Of Cargo Theft; To Provide For Certain Definitions; To Provide Penalties; To Provide For The Crime Of Unlawful Possession Or Use Of A Fifth Wheel; To Amend Section 97-25-25, In Conformity With This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cargo theft; provide for crime and penalties of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |