MS HB1263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalty For The Crime Of Manslaughter; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Manslaughter; revise penalty for.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2013/pdf/history/HB/HB1263.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2013/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1263IN.htm |