MS HB1240 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Liability Insurers To Disclose The Limits Of A Policy To A Third-party Claimant; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance; require liability insurer to disclose limits to third-party claimant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Insurance | |
2011-02-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Chism, Robinson, Jones (111th)) | |
2011-02-09 | Passed | |
2011-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | DR - TSDP: JB To IN | |
2011-01-26 | DR - TSDP: IN To JB | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Insurance;Judiciary B |