MS HB1207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Name The Alcorn State University Extension And Research Complex, Located In Lorman, Jefferson County, Mississippi, The "dr. Jesse Harness, Sr., Extension And Research Center"; To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration In Conjunction With The Department Of Public Safety To Erect The Proper Lettering Or Signage On The Outdoor Facade Of The Building Displaying The Official Name As The "dr. Jesse Harness, Sr., Extension And Research Center"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcorn University Extension Annex; rename the "Dr. Jesse Harness, Sr., Extension and Research Center".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: AP To PP |
2024-03-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PP To AP |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Property;Appropriations |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Property |