MS HB1173 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 31-7-9 And 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Provide Eef Classroom Supply Procurement Cards Or Credentials For A Digital Solution To Eligible Teachers Employed By Charter Schools; To Amend Section 37-28-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
EEF procurement cards; authorize issuance to eligible charter school teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 61 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |