MS HB1163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-5-9 And 21-19-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That, Regardless Of Whether A County Or Municipality Has Adopted Certain Construction Codes, A County Or Municipality, As The Case May Be, Shall Require Permitting As A Condition To Construction, And That Such Permits Shall Contain On Their Face The Contractor's Material Purchase Certificate Number To The Extent Furnished By The Department Of Revenue And The Contractor's License Or Certificate Of Responsibility Number As Required By Certain Sections Of Law; To Amend Sections 73-59-1, 73-59-3, 73-59-9 And 73-59-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are Sections Of Laws Regulating Residential Builders And Remodelers, To Define The Terms "construction Manager" And "residential Solar Contractor" For Purposes Of Such Sections Of Law, To Revise The Persons Or Entities That Must Be Licensed By The State Board Of Contractors Under Such Laws, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding Penalties For Persons Who Undertake To Perform The Business Of Residential Construction Or Improvement Without First Having A License; To Revise The Types Of Remedies Available To Such Persons Or Entities And To Revise The Types Of Residential Construction To Which Such Sections Of Laws Do Not Apply; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; revise definition of "installation charges" to exclude labor services in connection with residential roofing.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Thompson,Carter |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 19 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 59 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 59 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 59 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 59 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |