MS HB1159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 939, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 1046, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 921, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, As Amended By Chapter 937, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, To Extend The Repeal Date From December 31, 2020, To December 31, 2024, On The Law That Authorizes The City Of Florence To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of The Sales Of Bars And Restaurants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Florence; extend repealer on bar and restaurant tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-05-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |