MS HB1158 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 55-23-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Transfer Of Authority Over The Powers And Duties Related To The Administration Of The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium Property And The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium; To Provide For The Transfer Of Certain Parcels Of The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium Property Which Is The Subject Of A Certain Development Lease Agreement To The University Of Mississippi Medical Center; To Provide For The Transfer Of Certain Parcels Of The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium Property Consisting Of The Stadium And Parking To Jackson State University; To Provide That The Transfer Authorized Under This Act Is Subject To An Agreement Being Reached By The Department Of Finance And Administration, The University Of Mississippi Medical Center And The Current Developer Of The Property; To Amend Section 55-23-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Jackson State University And The University Of Mississippi Medical Center To Fully Comply With Existing Lease Agreements With Any Public Or Private Entities With Existing Interests In The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium Property Entered Into By The Department Of Finance And Administration; To Amend Section 55-23-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer The Management And Control Of Operating The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium From The Department Of Finance And Administration To Jackson State University; To Provide That Jackson State University Shall Maintain Control Of The Stadium Until Such Time That It Relocates Its Home Games To Another Venue; To Provide That All Monies And Revenues Arising From The Use Of The Stadium Shall Be Retained By Jackson State University For Operation, Maintenance, Improvements And Certain Other Purposes; To Repeal Section 2, Chapter 605, Laws Of 2007, Which Provides The Legislative Intent To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Cancel Leases Of The Mississippi Veterans Memorial Stadium Property; To Require That The Terms Of Leases For Current Lessees Be Fully Complied With And To Prevent The Use Of The Process Of Eminent Domain To Acquire Any Lessee's Property Interest; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Veterans Memorial Stadium; transfer authority over operation and administration to UMC, subject to certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-07 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | DR - TSDP: PP To AP | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Public Property;Appropriations | |
2011-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Point of Order-Not Well Taken | |
2011-02-10 | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Point of Order Raised | |
2011-02-10 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment Ruled Improper | |
2011-02-10 | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Point of Order Raised | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Public Property |