MS HB1157 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose A State Assessment Upon Persons Convicted Of A Felony, Which Shall Be Deposited Into The Crime Laboratory Dna Identification System Fund, To Impose An Additional Assessment Against Railroad Crossing Violations For The Benefit Of The Operation Lifesaver Program And Fund And To Impose An Additional Assessment For Violations Of The Uniform Controlled Substances Act; To Amend Section 45-1-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose Upon Individuals Convicted Of Certain Crimes A Separate Laboratory Analysis Fee In A Case Where The Crime Laboratory Provided Forensic Science Or Laboratory Services In Connection With The Case, Which Shall Be Deposited Into The Special Fund Of The Crime Laboratory; To Create The Operation Lifesaver Program Under The Auspices Of The Department Of Transportation And To Create The Operation Lifesaver Fund; To Create The Drug Evidence Disposition Fund Under The Control Of The Bureau Of Narcotics; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Statewide monetary assessments; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-18 | Conferees Named Fillingane,Albritton,Dickerson | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Stringer | |
2010-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Amended | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDP: AP To JA | |
2010-01-29 | DR - TSDPCS: JA To AP | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations |