MS HB1134 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Public Utility Rate Mitigation And Reduction Act; To Define Certain Terms As Used In The Act; To Provide A Mechanism Whereby The Public Service Commission Shall Enter A Financing Order Authorizing The Issuance Of Rate Reduction Bonds, The Proceeds Of Which Are Used To Recover, Finance Or Refinance Generation Facility Costs And Financing Costs For Certain Newly Constructed Base Load Electric Generating Facilities That Use Coal Gasification Or Clean Coal Technology; To Provide For The Implementation Or Adjustment Of A Rate Reduction Bond Charge; To Provide That The Rate Reduction Bonds Shall Not Constitute A Debt Or A Pledge Of The Faith And Credit Or Taxing Power Of The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Public Utility Rate Mitigation and Reduction Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2013-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-02-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Shirley, Beckett) |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Amended |
2013-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |