MS HB1132 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-92, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The Date By Which School Districts Having An Alternative School Program Are Required To Submit Annual Evaluation Reports To The State Department Of Education; To Authorize The Department To Prescribe Appropriate Measures For Those Districts Failing To Submit Reports In A Timely Manner; To Require Reports To Be Made Available Online Via The Department's Website; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Dept. of Education; authorize to prescribe appropriate measures for failure to timely file mandatory reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Jordan,Hale |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Clarke,Holloway |
2014-03-20 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2014-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-02-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Education |