MS HB1104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-33-173, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Credentialing Requirements Of Certain Persons Who Provide Interpreting Services To The Deaf And Hearing Impaired For A Fee, And To Grant The Mississippi Department Of Rehabilitation Services, Office On Deaf And Hard Of Hearing, Oversight Of Quality Assurance Evaluations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Interpreting services for the deaf and hard of hearing; revise credentialing requirements and related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |