MS HB1089 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-15-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase Compensation For Counsel Appointed To Indigents; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Indigent counsel; increase compensation for.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed |
2024-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |