MS HB1086 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Chapter In Title 67, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Mississippi Liquor Distribution Corporation Law; To Create The Liquor Distribution Corporation As A Wholesale Distributor And Seller Of Alcoholic Beverages In The State; To Define Terms; To Enumerate The Duties And Prerogatives Of The Corporation; To Constitute The Membership Of The Corporation's Board Of Directors And Enumerate The Board's Duties; To Allow The Board To Charge Fees To Defray The Costs Of Operating And Maintaining Facilities For The Distribution Of Alcoholic Beverages, To Be Used For The Renovation Or Expansion Of Corporation Equipment Or Property; To Provide For The Appointment, Term Of Office And Duties Of The Corporation's President; To Provide That The Corporation's Records Shall Be Public And Subject To Inspection, With Exceptions; To Permit Information-sharing Agreements Between The Corporation And The Department Of Revenue; To Allow The Corporation's Board Of Directors To Employ Attorneys And Contract With Outside Counsel; To Direct The Corporation To Maintain A Personnel Program With Benefits For Its Employees, Who Shall Serve At The Will And Pleasure Of The President And Shall Not Be Subject To Civil Service Provisions Or Be Considered Employees Of The State Of Mississippi; To Enumerate Prohibited Conflicts Of Interest, Provide Penalties For Violations, And Direct Enforcement By The State Ethics Commission; To Require The Corporation To Publish Quarterly And Annual Financial Statements To Be Available To The Public; To Authorize The Corporation To Enter Contracts And Adopt Procedures For Procurements; To Provide Funding For The Corporation Through A Corporate Operating Account Retained By And To The Credit Of The Liquor Distribution Corporation, To Contain Monies From The Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages And Other Sources; To Designate Officers And Employees Of The Corporation As Public Servants Under Section 25-4-103; To Require That Officers Of The Corporation File A Statement Of Economic Interest With The State Ethics Commission Under Section 25-4-25; To Require The Corporation To Submit Quarterly And Annual Reports And Financial Statements; To Require An Annual Audit Of The Corporation's Records By An Independent Auditor; To Require The Corporation To Submit Its Annual Operating Budget For The Upcoming Fiscal Year To The Joint Legislative Budget Committee; To Amend Sections 7-7-211, 25-9-107, 25-11-103, 25-41-3, 31-7-13, 27-71-1, 27-71-5, 27-71-7, 27-71-9, 27-71-11, 27-71-13, 27-71-15, 27-71-17, 27-71-23, 27-71-27, 27-71-29, 67-1-5, 67-1-9, 67-1-18, 67-1-19, 67-1-33, 67-1-37, 67-1-43, 67-1-45, 67-1-49, 67-1-51, 67-1-73, 67-5-5, 67-5-11 And 67-5-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; To Repeal Section 67-1-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Department Of Revenue As The Exclusive Wholesale Distributor And Seller Of Alcoholic Beverages Within The State Of Mississippi, Subject To Certain Exceptions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Liquor Distribution Corporation Law; create.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |