MS HB1067 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The State Department Of Health May Establish A Nurse-family Partnership Pilot Program In The State Of Mississippi; To Provide A Description Of The Program And The Components Included In The Program; To Provide The Goals Of The Program; To Provide That The Department Shall Encourage And Assist Public And Private Entities To Become Nurse-family Partnership Implementing Agencies At Sites Throughout The State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nurse-Family Partnership program; State Department of Health shall establish in MS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Bryan,Turner,Jackson (15th) | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Holland,Fredericks,Currie | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |