MS HB105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 41-67-1 Through 41-67-29 And 41-67-33 Through 41-67-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are The Mississippi Individual On-site Wastewater Disposal System Law; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions And Add Certain Definitions; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Certain Provisions Of Law Regarding Certified Professional Evaluators' Documentation And Approval From The Department Of Health When Designing A Design-based System; To Provide That No Fee Shall Be Charged To A Homeowner For Training To Assist The Homeowner In Maintaining The Homeowner's System; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Homeowners To Apply For A Variance From The Department Of Health By Issuing A Certain Report And Proof Of Errors And Omissions Insurance; To Require The Installer Or Certified Professional Evaluator To Notify The Department Of Health At Least Twenty-four Hours Before Beginning Construction Of A System; To Allow An Installer To Cover His Work With Soil Or Other Surface Material If A Health Inspector Does Not Arrive For Inspection After Twenty-four Hours From Notification And To Require The Installer To Submit An Affidavit Of Proper Installation To The Department For Final Approval If Such Occurs; To Revise The Provisions Of Law Regarding The Grandfathering Of Systems Existing On July 1, 2008; To Exempt Lots Of A Certain Acreage From The Requirements Relating To Approval Of Individual On-site Wastewater Disposal Systems By The Department, Provided That Certain Conditions Are Met; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Certain Provisions Of Law Regarding The Department's On-site Maintenance Training Program; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Health To Provide For Renewal Installer Certifications To Be Applied For At The Local Department Offices; To Provide That The Annual Fee For Installer Certifications Shall Not Be More Than Fifty Dollars; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Person May Operate As A Certified Maintenance Provider If He Is A Certified Installer; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Person May Operate As A Certified Professional Evaluator If He Is A Registered Professional Engineer; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-67-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Department Of Health May Suspend Or Revoke A Pumper's Certification If The Pumper Dumps Or Disposes Of Septage Or Other Liquid Waste In An Unpermitted Or Unapproved Site; To Allow Municipal Wastewater Treatment Facilities To Make A Site Available For Certified Pumpers To Dispose Of Septic Or Other Liquid Waste; To Require The Department Of Health To Provide For Renewal Pumper Certifications To Be Applied For And Granted At The Local Department Offices; To Create A New Section Of Law To Create The Wastewater Advisory Board For The Purpose Of Advising The Department Of Health Regarding Individual On-site Wastewater Disposal Systems; To Provide For The Composition Of The Board; To Amend Section 41-67-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Mississippi Individual On-site Wastewater Disposal System Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Individual On-site Wastewater Disposal System Law; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Mayo [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 103 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 90 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 90 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conferees Named Bryan,Burton,Frazier | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Mayo,Ellington,Holland | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-15 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Amended | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Read the Third Time | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-02-01 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To CR | |
2011-01-13 | DR - TSDPCS: CR To PH | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources;Public Health and Human Services |