MO SJR39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the Governor a list of all qualified nominees, rather than a list of three nominees, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan
Title
Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the Governor a list of all qualified nominees, rather than a list of three nominees, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 39-Hegeman |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838131 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR39.pdf |