MO SJR35 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Voted Do Not Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Voted Do Not Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to property taxes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to property taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Schroer [R] | Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Voted Do Not Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform |
2023-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform |
2023-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tax Reform |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tax Reform |
2023-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2023-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2023-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled |