MO SJR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the process for getting an initiative petition on the ballot
Title
Modifies the process for getting an initiative petition on the ballot
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0501S.02C) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |