MO SJR2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows enabling legislation for advance voting and photographic identification for voting
Title
Allows enabling legislation for advance voting and photographic identification for voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Secretary of State | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-09 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-09 | S concurs in HCS#2 | |
2011-05-02 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-02 | HCS#2 H adopted | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-04-13 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-13 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-12 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-04-12 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Bill returned to committee of origin | |
2011-03-16 | Voted to return bill to committee of origin | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-03-10 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Referred H Elections Committee | |
2011-03-01 | H Second Read | |
2011-02-24 | H First Read | |
2011-02-24 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-24 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Perfected | |
2011-02-16 | SA 3 S withdrawn | |
2011-02-14 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | SA 3 S offered (Green)--(0282S01.02F) | |
2011-02-14 | SA 2 S offered & withdrawn (Callahan)--(0282S01.01F) | |
2011-02-14 | SA 1 S offered & Ruled out of order (Callahan)--(0282S01.01S) | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-01-31 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SJR 2-Stouffer | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |