MO SJR18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 18-Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 18-Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new requirements relating to the verification of the immigration status of certain persons
Title
Creates new requirements relating to the verification of the immigration status of certain persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 18-Cunningham |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 18-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1977940 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR18.pdf |