MO SJR14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes excursion boat gambling on the Osage River
Title
Authorizes excursion boat gambling on the Osage River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | SS S offered (Brown (16))--(0839S.03F) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |