MO SCR9 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred H Select Committee on Budget Committee
Pending: House Select Committee on Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred H Select Committee on Budget Committee
Pending: House Select Committee on Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a higher education buildings project list to be funded by revenue bonds issued by the State Board of Public Buildings
Title
Creates a higher education buildings project list to be funded by revenue bonds issued by the State Board of Public Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Budget Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-02 | House | H First Read |
2015-01-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 9-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1518339 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR9.pdf |