MO SCR7 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the America 250 Missouri Commission
Title
Creates the America 250 Missouri Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SCR 7 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: SCR 7 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2023-05-10 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-10 | House | S concurs in HCS (Bernskoetter) |
2023-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | HCS H adopted |
2023-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2023-04-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2023-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2023-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tourism |
2023-03-28 | House | Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Tourism |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tourism |
2023-02-22 | House | H Second Read |
2023-02-21 | House | H First Read |
2023-02-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | S First Read |