MO SCR53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCRs 53 & 44-Schaefer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCRs 53 & 44-Schaefer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Title
Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCRs 53 & 44-Schaefer, with SCS |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Journal Correction to reflect SCS for SCRs 53 & 44 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee, with SCS |
2016-03-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SCRs 53 & 44) Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (5128S.02C) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | S First Read |