MO SCR43 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Missouri Public Service Commission to reaffirm state policies relating to natural gas hedging
Title
Urges the Missouri Public Service Commission to reaffirm state policies relating to natural gas hedging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SCR 43 SCRs FOR THIRD READING - INF (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 43-Munzlinger |