MO SCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Signed by House Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Signed by House Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for an Article V convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government
Title
Calls for an Article V convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution placing limits on the federal government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | HCS H defeated |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2021-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2021-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2021-05-03 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-29 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | S First Read |