MO SCR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 30-Schupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 30-Schupp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Buddy Check 22 Day to promote awareness of suicide risks in the military
Title
Establishes the Buddy Check 22 Day to promote awareness of suicide risks in the military
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 30-Schupp |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 30-Schupp |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28994586 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR30.pdf |