MO SCR24 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Special Committee on Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Special Committee on Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to offer full and unequivocal support to Israel in light of the unprovoked attacks on innocent civilians by Hamas
Title
Urges the U.S. Congress to offer full and unequivocal support to Israel in light of the unprovoked attacks on innocent civilians by Hamas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-02 | Senate | H Second Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | H Fist Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | S adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(5118S03.02S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee w/SCS |
2024-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/ SCS/SCRs 24 & 25) Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (5118S.03C) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | S Offered |