MO SCR20 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions - Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions - Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes every September 26th as Mesothelioma Awareness Day
Title
Recognizes every September 26th as Mesothelioma Awareness Day
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] | Sen. Gina Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions - Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 20-Walsh |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28333027 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR20.pdf |