MO SCR11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates every November as National American History and Founders Month
Title
Designates every November as National American History and Founders Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tourism |
2019-03-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-02-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 11-Hough |