MO SB996 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 996-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 996-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program
Title
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 996-Onder, with SCS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (5187S.05C) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 996-Onder |