MO SB99 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0648S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0648S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0648S.05C) | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2011-01-12 | S First Read--SB 99-Chappelle-Nadal |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4074445 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB99.pdf |