MO SB969 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 969-Keaveny
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 969-Keaveny
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to school attendance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to school attendance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 969-Keaveny | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | Perfected | |
2010-04-27 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-27 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4785S05.01F) | |
2010-04-26 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-26 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2010-04-22 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-04-21 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - 4785S.05C | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2010-02-18 | S First Read--SB 969-Keaveny |