MO SB95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration dates on certain provisions relating to public funds
Title
Extends the expiration dates on certain provisions relating to public funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 95 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 95 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 (HA 4) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 49 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 95 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 (HA 4) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 49 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 95 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Sater)--(0355S03.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0355S03.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Wasson, Hegeman, Rizzo, Sifton |
2017-05-11 | House | H conferees appointed: Fraker, Haahr, Rhoads, Baringer, McCreery |
2017-05-11 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-11 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-11 | House | H refuses to recede & requests S take up and pass bill |
2017-05-11 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede & take up and pass bill |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Baringer)--(0355H02.19H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(0355H02.65H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(0355H02.38H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Love)--(0355H02.44H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 95-Sater |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |