MO SB946 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the expiration date for the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Title
Repeals the expiration date for the Basic Civil Legal Services Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |