MO SB930 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (3573S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (3573S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the Missouri Sunshine Law
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the Missouri Sunshine Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (3573S.05C) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |