MO SB915 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 915-Crawford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 915-Crawford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to contingency fee contracts entered into by the state
Title
Modifies provisions relating to contingency fee contracts entered into by the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 915-Crawford |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | S First Read--SB 915-Crawford |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71841079 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB915.pdf |