MO SB905 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 905-Mayer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 905-Mayer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain political subdivisions to contract out engineering, water quality management, and maintenance services on existing water storage tanks
Title
Allows certain political subdivisions to contract out engineering, water quality management, and maintenance services on existing water storage tanks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 905-Mayer | |
2012-04-18 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2012-04-10 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-03-01 | S First Read--SB 905-Mayer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3165967 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB905.pdf |