MO SB901 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3241S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3241S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of aggravated fleeing a stop or detention of a motor vehicle
Title
Creates the offense of aggravated fleeing a stop or detention of a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 901 & 820) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (3241S.02C) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |