MO SB9 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the state do-not-call list and creates "paid for by" requirements for political phone calls
Title
Modifies the state do-not-call list and creates "paid for by" requirements for political phone calls
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Rupp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Elections Committee | |
2011-04-11 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-07 | H First Read | |
2011-04-07 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected | |
2011-04-04 | SS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0250S.02F) | |
2011-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-15 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 9-Rupp | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |