MO SB889 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regarding the jurisdiction of the Attorney General for violations of certain offenses and creates the offense of vehicle hijacking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regarding the jurisdiction of the Attorney General for violations of certain offenses and creates the offense of vehicle hijacking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-03-02SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-02-27SenateRe-referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-02-27SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-15SenateS First Read--SB 889-Koenig

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback