MO SB886 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds an element to the crime of aggravated or first degree stalking
Title
Adds an element to the crime of aggravated or first degree stalking
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 886-Walsh |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=24289069 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB886.pdf |