MO SB884 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 884 (HA 2, A.A.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 884 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (*HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (*HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 37 N: 91 NV: 7 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 884 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (*HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (*HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 37 N: 91 NV: 7 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 884 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-05-17 | Senate | H distributes CCR (5722S03.01F) |
2018-05-17 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Koenig) |
2018-05-17 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Koenig, Eigel, Onder, Rizzo, Holsman |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Wiemann, Haahr, Fitzpatrick, Carpenter, Kendrick |
2018-05-17 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-17 | House | S refuses to concur in SB 884-Koenig, with HA 1 & HA 2, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 2, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Wiemann)--(5722S01.23H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & defeated (Quade)--(5722S01.20H) |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 2 H offered (Fitzpatrick)--(5722S01.16H) |
2018-05-17 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Wiemann)--(5722S01.14S) |
2018-05-17 | House | HCS H Defeated |
2018-05-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2018-04-02 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 884-Koenig |