MO SB88 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to guardians ad litem
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to guardians ad litem
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-10 | House | Executive Session Cancelled H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0665S01.07S) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(0665S01.04S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 88-Libla |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |