MO SB87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to breast-feeding
Title
Modifies provisions relating to breast-feeding
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] | Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Emery)--(0611S02.01S) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (0611S.02C) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 87-Schaaf |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |