MO SB864 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - In Conference--SB 864-Sater, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - In Conference--SB 864-Sater, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that only a licensed pharmacist can determine to dispense an emergency supply of medication without the prescriber's authorization and may dispense varying quantities of maintenance medication
Title
Provides that only a licensed pharmacist can determine to dispense an emergency supply of medication without the prescriber's authorization and may dispense varying quantities of maintenance medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 864 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | In Conference--SB 864-Sater, with HCS, as amended |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Wasson, Riddle, Sifton, Schupp |
2016-05-05 | House | H conferees appointed: Morris, Engler, White, Rizzo, Kirkton |
2016-05-05 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-03 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rizzo)--(5462H02.19H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(5462H02.21H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(5462H02.03H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5462H02.18H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(5462H02.13H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(5462H02.20H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Morris)--(5462H02.07H) |
2016-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 864-Sater |