MO SB856 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred H Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred H Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a tax deduction for employee stock ownership plans
Title
Creates a tax deduction for employee stock ownership plans
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2016-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (5628S.02C) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 856-Silvey |