MO SB852 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred H Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred H Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain corporations to organize under The General and Business Corporation Law of Missouri to supply telephone and telecommunications services in rural areas
Title
Allows certain corporations to organize under The General and Business Corporation Law of Missouri to supply telephone and telecommunications services in rural areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Referred H Utilities |
2020-05-01 | House | H Second Read |
2020-04-30 | House | H First Read |
2020-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - Consent vote adopted (4796S.02C) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4796S.02C) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 852-Hegeman |